## Search found 5869 matches

- Sep 08, 2020 17:44
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@Dodicat Never mind... I played with your code and got it working.... How do you modify it , so it doesn't make a fraction at the end??? screen 19 Function halfer(fl As String) As String Dim As Ubyte main,carry,temp Dim As String sign ,s If Instr(fl,".")=0 Then s=fl+".0" Else s=f...

- Sep 07, 2020 23:12
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@Dodicat Can you make it so it returns a character string??? As you half , it need to output a chr , instead of a number.. I was confused by the halfing... If you have chr( 255 ) and chr( 255) You half the first chr , you end up with a 127.5 , and you have to add the point 5 to the next chr.. but th...

- Sep 07, 2020 18:15
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@Dodicat

I remember you did a "Halfer" ( div 2 ) fuinction , a while back..

How would you do a halfer for character strings??

&@W#E$R / 2 = ???

Where the output would also be in characters....

I remember you did a "Halfer" ( div 2 ) fuinction , a while back..

How would you do a halfer for character strings??

&@W#E$R / 2 = ???

Where the output would also be in characters....

- Sep 06, 2020 22:38
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@Dodicat You got the "Linux" source in your above post.. The "Windows" source has the voice stuff at the top... Otherwise: I'm out of paper.... I've filled a 500 page notebook with manipulation formulas over the last two weeks.. 1000 pages.. Got to buy another 500 page notebook...

- Sep 06, 2020 2:03
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

For "Five Deck Maverick" Here's the "Linux" source You need to install "Flite" to get the speech engine to work.. '=============================================================================== #Include Once "GL/glu.bi" #include Once "GL/glext.bi" #...

- Sep 06, 2020 2:01
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

For "Five Deck Maverick" Here's the "Windows" source #include once "windows.bi" #include once "win/winnt.bi" #include once "win/objbase.bi" #inclib "ole32" Dim shared IID_ISpVoice As GUID => ( &H6c44df74, &H72b9, &H4992, {&H...

- Sep 06, 2020 0:24
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@StoneMonkey Here's one me and Dodicat did together.. "Five Deck Maverick" It uses five decks of cards on a casino type "Slot Machine". Five wheels Each wheel has a whole deck of cards.. It works on FB 32 bit , not sure of FB 64 bit.. Its Open GL For some reason , after playing f...

- Sep 04, 2020 23:59
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

I came up with an interesting formula... 246 x 246 = 60516 041636 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits.. cascade add the square 41636 041636 0041636 Add the diagonals.. 124908 124908 x .5 = 62454 62454 -60516 ------------ 1938 <--- don't know how to get the 1938 value???? 246 x 8 = 1968 ...

- Sep 04, 2020 23:52
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@everybody

If your playing with numbers , and find a particular set of patterns or something interesting in the values then post it here....

This Topic is for number manipulations and tricks...

If your playing with numbers , and find a particular set of patterns or something interesting in the values then post it here....

This Topic is for number manipulations and tricks...

- Sep 04, 2020 23:48
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@StoneMonkey I tried it on several sets of 3 digits and it doesn't seem to work on other numbers... Like i said above I come up with a formula off the top of my head , using just the right numbers to make it work.. I don't know how i do it??? My brain , picks out the formula for a particular set of ...

- Sep 04, 2020 21:29
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

Another trick i just learned...

123 x 123 = 15129

123

246

369

Multiply each column: and shift..

3 x 6 x 9 = 162

2 x 4 x 6 = 480

1 x 2 x 3 = 6000

Added up = 6642

6642 x 2 = 13284

246 x 7 = 1722 + 123 = 1845 <-- our adder

13284 + 1845 = 15129 <--- correct answer

123 x 123 = 15129

123

246

369

Multiply each column: and shift..

3 x 6 x 9 = 162

2 x 4 x 6 = 480

1 x 2 x 3 = 6000

Added up = 6642

6642 x 2 = 13284

246 x 7 = 1722 + 123 = 1845 <-- our adder

13284 + 1845 = 15129 <--- correct answer

- Sep 03, 2020 23:34
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

Another number trick... I just invented... 12 x 12 = 144 0104 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits. double the value 0104 +0104 --------- 208 double firs digit to 20 instead of 10 20 -12 <-- subtract number ----- 8 x8 <-- square the subtraction ---- 64 <-- our subtractor 208 - 64 ------ ...

- Sep 03, 2020 22:08
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

With 4 digits there's two sets of adds.. 1234 x 1234 = 1522756 01040916 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits. 1522756 -1040916 ------------- 481840 <--- difference first set of adds 1000 x 200 = 200000 1000 x 30 = 30000 1000 x 4 = 4000 second set of adds 200 x 30 = 6000 200 x 4 = 800 30 ...

- Sep 03, 2020 20:49
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

I got the formula finished... 123 x 123 = 15129 010409 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits.. 15129 -10409 ---------- 4720 <-- difference 100 x 20 = 2000 100 x 3 = 300 20 x 3 = 60 2360 x 2 = 4720 <-- our difference. Since were multplying 2 sets , we need to double the output 10409 + 4720...

- Sep 03, 2020 17:27
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@fxm 44 x 44 = 1936 ------------------------ add 22 = 66 x 66 = 4356 sub 22 = 22 x 22 = 484 ----------------------- 4356 - 484 -------- 3872 x .5 or ( / 2 ) ------- 1936 <-- correct answer I was trying to find a way to get the square of a even mul of 10.. And then divide by the difference.. But with...