I found an interesting formula..

44 x 44 = 1936

------------------------

66 x 66 = 4356

22 x 22 = 484

-----------------------

4356 - 484 = 3872 x .5 = 1936

It doesn't work with other squares..

## Search found 5869 matches

- Sep 03, 2020 3:21
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

- Sep 03, 2020 2:20
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@StoneMonkey

The formulas I'm working on , i can't write a program , till I've got several that match a rule..

So i have to do the manipulations on paper , until i get several sets of numbers working , with a particular rule..

Once i figure out the rule , then i can write a program...

The formulas I'm working on , i can't write a program , till I've got several that match a rule..

So i have to do the manipulations on paper , until i get several sets of numbers working , with a particular rule..

Once i figure out the rule , then i can write a program...

- Sep 02, 2020 23:55
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

@StoneMonkey I've filled a 500 page notebook in the last couple days , working on number manipulations... The above 12 x 14 = 168 formula , only works on those 2 numbers.. I tried all different numbers and it doesn't work on other numbers.. I don't know how i do it ???? I come up with a formula usin...

- Sep 01, 2020 23:38
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

Another trick, I just invented.. I only tried on these 2 numbers ( i''l have to play around with different numbers ) 12 x 14 = 168 0104 <-- square first number 12 , and make each digit into 2 digits 0116 <-- square second number 14, and make each digit into 2 digits add them 104 116 ------ 220 12 + ...

- Sep 01, 2020 20:31
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

it was a waste of time....You have to cascade add again... 1234 ( 4 digits ) 1234 x 1234 = 1522756 01040916 <-- square each number and make them all 2 digits.. 234 + 234 x 1000 = 468000 34 + 34 x 200 = 13600 4 + 4 x 30 = 240 With 2 digits we have 1 add With 3 digits we have 2 adds.. With 4 digits we...

- Sep 01, 2020 19:49
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

With 246 ( 3 digits )

246 x 246 = 60516

041636 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits..

60516

-41636

----------

18880

46 + 46 x 200 = 18400

6 + 6 x 40 = 480

18400 + 480 = 18880

41636 + 18880 = 60516 <-- correct answer

246 x 246 = 60516

041636 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits..

60516

-41636

----------

18880

46 + 46 x 200 = 18400

6 + 6 x 40 = 480

18400 + 480 = 18880

41636 + 18880 = 60516 <-- correct answer

- Sep 01, 2020 18:37
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

With 123 ( 3 digits )

123 x 123 = 15129

010409 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits..

15129

-10409

---------

4720

23 + 23 x 100 = 4600

3 + 3 x 20 = 120

4600 + 120 = 4720

10409 + 4720 = 15129 <-- correct answer...

123 x 123 = 15129

010409 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits..

15129

-10409

---------

4720

23 + 23 x 100 = 4600

3 + 3 x 20 = 120

4600 + 120 = 4720

10409 + 4720 = 15129 <-- correct answer...

- Sep 01, 2020 17:28
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

I found a way to square 2 digits with an add... 11 x 11 = 121 0101 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits 1 + 1 = 2 * 10 = 20 0101 + 20 = 121 <-- correct answer 23 x 23 = 529 0409 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits 3 + 3 = 6 x 20 = 120 0409 + 120 = 529 <-- correct answer Inst...

- Sep 01, 2020 1:09
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

I got it working with 2 and 3 digit numbers.. 123 x 123 = 15129 010409 <-- square each digit and make them all 2 digits 23 x 100 x 2 = 4600 20 x 3 x 2 = 120 4600 + 120 = 4720 010409 ---4720 <-- add 4720 ----------- 015129 <-- correct answer Another: 246 x 246 = 60516 041636 <-- square each digit and...

- Aug 31, 2020 19:44
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

Got the 1's and 10's done...

Now to work on 20's to 90's , then on to 3 digit numbers..

Now to work on 20's to 90's , then on to 3 digit numbers..

- Aug 31, 2020 19:41
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

10 x 10 = 100

1000 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 0 x 10 )

-100

------

900

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 0 = 9 , ( 9 x 0 ) = 0

tot = 800

0900

-800

-------

100 <-- were off ( under ) by 00 ( 00 + 00 )

1000 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 0 x 10 )

-100

------

900

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 0 = 9 , ( 9 x 0 ) = 0

tot = 800

0900

-800

-------

100 <-- were off ( under ) by 00 ( 00 + 00 )

- Aug 31, 2020 19:02
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

18 x 18 = 324

1080 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 8 x 10 )

-108

------

972

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 8 = 1 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

tot = 808

0972

-808

-------

164 <-- were off ( under ) by 160 ( 80 + 80 )

1080 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 8 x 10 )

-108

------

972

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 8 = 1 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

tot = 808

0972

-808

-------

164 <-- were off ( under ) by 160 ( 80 + 80 )

- Aug 31, 2020 18:51
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

13 x 13 = 169

1030 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 3 x 10 )

-103

------

927

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 3 = 6 , ( 6 x 3 ) = 18

tot = 818

0927

-818

-------

109 <-- were off ( under ) by 60 ( 30 + 30 )

1030 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 3 x 10 )

-103

------

927

9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8

9 - 3 = 6 , ( 6 x 3 ) = 18

tot = 818

0927

-818

-------

109 <-- were off ( under ) by 60 ( 30 + 30 )

- Aug 31, 2020 18:43
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

I'm working on a way to square large numbers.... With only shifts , adds , subtracts , and maybe a single or double digit multply.. 14 x 14 = 196 1040 ( 1 x 10 ) added to ( 4 x 10 ) 0104 ------ 0936 9 - 1 = 8 , ( 8 x 1 ) = 8 9 - 4 = 5 , ( 5 x 4 ) = 20 tot = 820 0936 -820 ------ 116 <-- were off ( un...

- Aug 31, 2020 17:36
- Forum: General
- Topic: Number Trick
- Replies:
**126** - Views:
**3701**

### Re: Number Trick

Another number trick, i just came up with... 90 -9 --- 81 -81 --- 0 <-- diff = 9 - 9 * 9 ================ 80 -8 --- 72 -64 ---- 8 <-- diff = 9 - 8 * 8 ================ 70 -7 --- 63 -49 ----- 14 <-- diff = 9 - 7 * 7 ================ 60 -6 ---- 54 -36 ----- 18 <-- diff = 9 - 6 * 6 ================ 50 ...